Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Arulselvam Rayappan

Bishop of Salem, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Nov 1960 Born
20 May 198625.5Ordained PriestPriest of Pondicherry and Cuddalore, India
31 May 202160.5AppointedBishop of Salem, India
4 Aug 202160.7Ordained BishopBishop of Salem, India

MicroData Summary for Arulselvam Rayappan
Bishop Arulselvam Rayappan (born ) Bishop of Salem

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSathipattu, Archdiocese of Pondicherry and Cuddalore
Ordained BishopInfant Jesus, Cathedral, Salem, Diocese of Salem

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Salem.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 31 May 2021
  • ob: CB, 17 Jul 2021
  • c2+: CB, 31 Jul 2021
  • c2: CB, 4 Aug 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 6 Aug 2021

Quantcast