Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Elie-Jean-Joseph Morel, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Pondicherry, India

Titular Archbishop of Cotrada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Dec 1862Born
24 Sep 188724.7Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
11 May 190946.3AppointedArchbishop of Pondicherry, India
21 Sep 190946.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Pondicherry, India
16 Aug 192966.6ResignedArchbishop of Pondicherry, India
16 Aug 192966.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Cotrada
15 Jun 194885.4DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Pondicherry, India

MicroData Summary for Elie-Jean-Joseph Morel
Archbishop Elie-Jean-Joseph Morel M.E.P. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Pondicherry

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBellefontaine, France

  • a priest for 60.7 years
  • a bishop for 38.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1909, Number 63
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 536, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast