Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michel Marie Paul Saudreau

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Le Havre, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Mar 1928Born
28 Jun 195224.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Paris, France
4 Apr 195325.0Ordained PriestPriest of Paris, France
6 Jul 197446.2AppointedBishop of Le Havre, France
22 Sep 197446.4Ordained BishopBishop of Le Havre, France
9 Jul 200375.2RetiredBishop of Le Havre, France
1 Jun 200779.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Le Havre, France

MicroData Summary for Michel Marie Paul Saudreau (VIAF: 24728174)
Bishop Michel Marie Paul Saudreau (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Le Havre

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained DeaconSt-Joseph des Carmes of Catholic Institute, Chapel, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained PriestSt-Joseph des Carmes of Catholic Institute, Chapel, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame, Cathedral, Le Havre, Diocese of Le Havre
Death PlaceParis, Archdiocese of Paris
Buried Place (Original)Notre-Dame, Cathedral, Le Havre, Diocese of Le Havre

  • a priest for 54.1 years
  • a bishop for 32.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • c1: CB
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Necrology (back)
  • od/c01/loc: AJ, 3 Jul 2018
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 25, Number 1,440

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast