Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pietro Rota

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Mantova, Italy

Titular Archbishop of Thebae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jan 1805Born
Sep 1827²22.5Ordained PriestPriest of Reggio Emilia, Italy
23 Mar 185550.1AppointedBishop of Guastalla, Italy
25 Mar 185550.1Ordained BishopBishop of Guastalla, Italy
1 Jun 185550.3InstalledBishop of Guastalla, Italy
27 Oct 187166.7AppointedBishop of Mantova, Italy
25 Dec 187166.9InstalledBishop of Mantova, Italy
3 May 187974.2RetiredBishop of Mantova, Italy
12 May 187974.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Cartagine
4 Nov 188479.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Thebae
3 Feb 189085.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Mantova, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pietro Rota (VIAF: 88903205)
Archbishop Pietro Rota (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Mantova

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCorreggio, Diocese of Reggio Emilia
Ordained BishopS. Augustin, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 62.4 years
  • a bishop for 34.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 185, and Page 294
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 364, and Page 546
  • c34: CB, 18 Jul 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1855, Number 11
  • opd/c1/loc: CB, 12 Apr 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 13 Apr 2021

Quantcast