Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joachim Ruhuna

Deceased

Archbishop of Gitega, Burundi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Oct 1933Born
18 Sep 196228.8Ordained PriestPriest of Gitega, Burundi
13 Apr 197339.4AppointedBishop of Ruyigi, Burundi
25 Jul 197339.7Ordained BishopBishop of Ruyigi, Burundi
28 Mar 198046.4AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Gitega, Burundi
6 Nov 198249.0SucceededArchbishop of Gitega, Burundi
9 Sep 199662.8DiedArchbishop of Gitega, Burundi

MicroData Summary for Joachim Ruhuna
Archbishop Joachim Ruhuna (born , died ) Archbishop of Gitega

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNyabikere
Ordained BishopMartyrs Baganda, Church, Ruyigi, Diocese of Ruyigi

  • a priest for 33.9 years
  • a bishop for 23.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 22, Number 1,229
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 26, Number 1,476

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast