Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Vincent Paschal Rowland, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Dundee, South Africa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Mar 1929Born
21 Mar 195324.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
17 Mar 198353.9AppointedBishop of Dundee, South Africa
17 Sep 198354.4Ordained BishopBishop of Dundee, South Africa
30 Sep 200576.5RetiredBishop of Dundee, South Africa
23 Sep 201283.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Dundee, South Africa

MicroData Summary for Michael Vincent Paschal Rowland
Bishop Michael Vincent Paschal Rowland O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Dundee

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGrays
Ordained BishopHoly Rosary, Cathedral, Dundee, Diocese of Dundee

  • a priest for 59.5 years
  • a bishop for 29.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 30 Sep 2005
  • d: CB, 23 Sep 2012
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 82, Number 6,746

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast