Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Martin Roos

Bishop Emeritus of Timişoara, Romania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Oct 1942 Born
3 Jul 197128.7Ordained PriestPriest of Timişoara, Romania
24 Jun 199956.6AppointedBishop of Timişoara, Romania
28 Aug 199956.8Ordained BishopBishop of Timişoara, Romania
16 May 201875.5RetiredBishop of Timişoara, Romania
6 Mar 202077.3AppointedApostolic Administrator of Zrenjanin, Serbia
25 Aug 202077.8CeasedApostolic Administrator of Zrenjanin, Serbia

MicroData Summary for Martin Roos (VIAF: 64586617)
Bishop Martin Roos (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Timişoara

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSatchinez
Ordained BishopCathedral, Timişoara, Diocese of Timişoara

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Timişoara.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 156, Number 13,601
  • r: Bollettino, 16 May 2018
  • ab: CB, 6 Mar 2020
  • ceas: CB, 18 Sep 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast