Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bartholomeus van Roijen

Bishop of Corner Brook and Labrador, Newfoundland, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Aug 1965 Born
25 Apr 199731.7Ordained PriestPriest of Nelson, British Columbia, Canada
7 Oct 201954.1AppointedBishop of Corner Brook and Labrador, Newfoundland, Canada
12 Dec 201954.3Ordained BishopBishop of Corner Brook and Labrador, Newfoundland, Canada

MicroData Summary for Bartholomeus van Roijen
Bishop Bartholomeus van Roijen (born ) Bishop of Corner Brook and Labrador

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDiemen, Diocese of Haarlem, Netherlands
Ordained BishopMost Holy Redeemer and of the Immaculate Conception, Cathedral, Corner Brook, Diocese of Corner Brook and Labrador, Newfoundland

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Corner Brook and Labrador.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 7 Oct 2019
  • ob: CB, 7 Oct 2019
  • c2+: CB, 29 Oct 2019
  • fn/ln: CB, 30 Oct 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 242, Number 20,282

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast