Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tomás Roda y Rodríguez

Deceased

Bishop of Jaén, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Sep 1779Born
27 Feb 185272.4SelectedBishop of Menorca, Spain
27 Sep 185273.0ConfirmedBishop of Menorca, Spain
21 Dec 185273.2Ordained BishopBishop of Menorca, Spain
20 Aug 185777.9SelectedBishop of Jaén, Spain
25 Sep 185778.0ConfirmedBishop of Jaén, Spain
11 Mar 185878.4DiedBishop of Jaén, Spain

MicroData Summary for Tomás Roda y Rodríguez
Bishop Tomás Roda y Rodríguez (born , died ) Bishop of Jaén

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMurtas
Ordained BishopMadrid, Archdiocese of Toledo

  • a bishop for 5.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 286, and Page 386
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 161, Number 885
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1852, Number 51
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 45, Number 3,048

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast