Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Orlando Roa Barbosa

Archbishop of Ibagué, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jul 1958 Born
6 Dec 198426.4Ordained PriestPriest of Ibagué, Colombia
12 May 201253.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Ibagué, Colombia
12 May 201253.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Nasbinca
28 Jul 201254.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nasbinca
30 May 201556.9AppointedBishop of Espinal, Colombia
18 Jul 201557.0InstalledBishop of Espinal, Colombia
29 May 202061.9AppointedArchbishop of Ibagué, Colombia
18 Jul 202062.0InstalledArchbishop of Ibagué, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Orlando Roa Barbosa
Archbishop Orlando Roa Barbosa (born ) Archbishop of Ibagué

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCali
Ordained BishopCathedral, Ibagué, Archdiocese of Ibagué

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Ibagué.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 12 May 2012
  • ob: CB, 12 May 2012
  • c2+: CB, 26 Jul 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Number 17,511
  • ab: Bollettino, 30 May 2015
  • i: CB, 13 Jun 2015
  • ab: Bollettino, 29 May 2020
  • i: CB, 21 Jun 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast