Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Paul Ri Moun-hi

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Daegu {Taegu}, Korea (South)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Sep 1935Born
27 Jun 196529.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Daegu {Taegu}, Korea (South)
23 Dec 196530.2Ordained PriestPriest of Daegu {Taegu}, Korea (South)
19 Sep 197237.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Daegu {Taegu}, Korea (South)
19 Sep 197237.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Forconium
30 Nov 197237.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Forconium
5 Jan 198549.3AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Daegu {Taegu}, Korea (South)
5 Jul 198650.8SucceededArchbishop of Daegu {Taegu}, Korea (South)
29 Mar 200771.5ResignedArchbishop of Daegu {Taegu}, Korea (South)
14 Mar 202185.5DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Daegu {Taegu}, Korea (South)

MicroData Summary for Paul Ri Moun-hi
Archbishop Paul Ri Moun-hi (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Daegu {Taegu}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTaegu
Ordained DeaconSaint-Joseph des Carmes de l’Institut Catholique, Church, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris, France
Ordained PriestSaint-Sulpice, Church, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris, France
Ordained BishopOur Lady of Lourdes, Cathedral, Taegu, Archdiocese of Daegu {Taegu}
Death PlaceCatholic University, Hospital, Daegu, Archdiocese of Daegu {Taegu}

  • a priest for 55.2 years
  • a bishop for 48.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 29 Mar 2007
  • od/c01: AJ, 4 May 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 27, Number 1,507
  • d: CB, 13 Mar 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 15 Mar 2021

Quantcast