Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Christian Heribert Riesbeck, C.C.

Bishop of Saint John, New Brunswick, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Feb 1970 Born
12 Oct 199626.6Ordained PriestPriest of Ottawa, Ontario, Canada
2003²32.9IncardinatedPriest of Companions of the Cross
7 Jan 201443.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Ottawa, Ontario, Canada
7 Jan 201443.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Tipasa in Numidia
19 Mar 201444.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tipasa in Numidia
15 Oct 201949.6AppointedBishop of Saint John, New Brunswick, Canada
9 Dec 201949.8InstalledBishop of Saint John, New Brunswick, Canada

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Christian Heribert Riesbeck
Bishop Christian Heribert Riesbeck C.C. (born ) Bishop of Saint John, New Brunswick

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontréal
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame, Cathedral Basilica, Ottawa, Archdiocese of Ottawa, Ontario

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Saint John, New Brunswick.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 7 Jan 2014
  • ob/c2: CB, 7 Jan 2014
  • c34: CB, 21 Jan 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 217, Number 18,114
  • ab: Bollettino, 15 Oct 2019
  • i: CB, 16 Oct 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast