Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Canuto José Reyes y Balladares

Deceased

Bishop of Granada, Nicaragua


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Sep 1863Born
12 Jun 188723.7Ordained PriestPriest of León en Nicaragua
12 Jul 191551.8AppointedBishop of Granada, Nicaragua
14 Nov 191552.1Ordained BishopBishop of Granada, Nicaragua
3 Nov 195188.1DiedBishop of Granada, Nicaragua

MicroData Summary for Canuto José Reyes y Balladares
Bishop Canuto José Reyes y Balladares (born , died ) Bishop of Granada

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLeón
Ordained BishopManagua

  • a priest for 64.3 years
  • a bishop for 35.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 187
  • b/c23: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1915, Number 72
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 46, Number 3,110

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast