Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ambrogio Ravasi, I.M.C. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Marsabit, Kenya


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Feb 1929Born
9 Feb 195728.0Ordained PriestPriest of Consolata Missionaries
19 Jun 198152.3AppointedBishop of Marsabit, Kenya
18 Oct 198152.6Ordained BishopBishop of Marsabit, Kenya
25 Nov 200677.7RetiredBishop of Marsabit, Kenya
30 Oct 202091.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Marsabit, Kenya

MicroData Summary for Ambrogio Ravasi
Bishop Ambrogio Ravasi I.M.C. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Marsabit

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBellusco, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}, Italy
Ordained BishopBellusco, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}, Italy
Death PlaceHospital, Nairobi, Archdiocese of Nairobi
Buried Place (Original)Maria Mfariji, Shrine, Marsabit, Diocese of Marsabit

  • a priest for 63.7 years
  • a bishop for 39.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 25 Nov 2006
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 172, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • bpd: AM, 8 Jul 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 69, Number 5,495
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 70, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 71, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • d: CB, 30 Oct 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast