Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joćo de Deus Ramalho, S.J. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Macau, China

Titular Bishop of Philadelphia in Lydia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jan 1890Born
190615.9ProfessedMember of Society of Jesus
30 Jul 192131.5Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
24 Sep 194252.7AppointedBishop of Macau, China
13 Dec 194252.9Ordained BishopBishop of Macau, China
9 Dec 195363.9ResignedBishop of Macau, China
9 Dec 195363.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Philadelphia in Lydia
25 Feb 195868.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Macau, China

MicroData Summary for Joćo de Deus Ramalho
Bishop Joćo de Deus Ramalho S.J. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Macau

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSćo Vicente da Beira, Diocese of Guarda, Portugal
Ordained BishopShui-hang

  • a priest for 36.5 years
  • a bishop for 15.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1942, Number 64
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 20 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast