Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Javier de Irastorza y Loinaz

Deceased

Bishop of Orihuela, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Feb 1875Born
20 Sep 190227.5Ordained PriestPriest
11 Jul 191439.3AppointedPrelate of Ciudad Real, Spain
11 Jul 191439.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Dora
22 Nov 191439.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dora
27 Jun 192247.3AppointedBishop of Orihuela, Spain
31 Jan 192347.9InstalledBishop of Orihuela, Spain
29 Dec 194368.8DiedBishop of Orihuela, Spain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Javier de Irastorza y Loinaz (VIAF: 258378958)
Bishop Francisco Javier de Irastorza y Loinaz (born , died ) Bishop of Orihuela

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Sebastián
Ordained BishopSanta María, Church, San Sebastián
Death PlaceSan Sebastián

  • a priest for 41.2 years
  • a bishop for 29.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1914, Number 66
  • ob.loc: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 81, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast