Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Enrique Cardinal Pla y Deniel

Deceased

Archbishop of Toledo, Spain

Cardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Montorio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Dec 1876Born
15 Jul 190023.5Ordained PriestPriest of Barcelona, Spain
4 Dec 191841.9AppointedBishop of Ávila, Spain
8 Jun 191942.4Ordained BishopBishop of Ávila, Spain
28 Jan 193558.1AppointedBishop of Salamanca, Spain
31 Oct 194164.8AppointedArchbishop of Toledo, Spain
18 Feb 194669.1Elevated to Cardinal
22 Feb 194669.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Montorio
5 Jul 196891.5DiedArchbishop of Toledo, Spain

MicroData Summary for Enrique Pla y Deniel
Enrique Cardinal Pla y Deniel (born , died ) Archbishop of Toledo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBarcelona

  • a priest for 67.9 years
  • a bishop for 49.0 years
  • a cardinal for 22.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 34
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1919, Number 33
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 12, Number 649, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 13, Number 695, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast