Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Joseph Rafferty

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Perth, Australia

Titular Bishop of Pharan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Aug 1912Born
25 Apr 193623.7Ordained PriestPriest of Perth, Australia
12 Jun 195542.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Perth, Australia
12 Jun 195542.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Pharan
26 Oct 195543.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pharan
6 Jan 196249.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Perth, Australia

MicroData Summary for John Joseph Rafferty
Bishop John Joseph Rafferty (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Perth

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKillaloe, Diocese of Killaloe, Ireland
Ordained BishopSt. Mary, Cathedral, Perth, Archdiocese of Perth

  • a priest for 25.6 years
  • a bishop for 6.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bd/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1955, Number 95
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 72, Number 5,763

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast