Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wellington de Queiroz Vieira

Bishop of Cristalândia, Goias, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jul 1968 Born
8 Dec 199628.4Ordained PriestPriest of Tocantinópolis, Tocatins, Brazil
16 Nov 201648.3AppointedPrelate of Cristalândia, Goias, Brazil
4 Feb 201748.5Ordained BishopPrelate of Cristalândia, Goias, Brazil
10 Jul 201950.9AppointedBishop of Cristalândia, Goias, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Wellington de Queiroz Vieira
Bishop Wellington de Queiroz Vieira (born ) Bishop of Cristalândia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTocantinópolis, Territorial Prelature of Tocantinópolis, Tocatins
Ordained BishopNossa Senhora do Perpétuo Socorro, Cathedral, Cristalândia, Territorial Prelature of Cristalândia, Goias

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Cristalândia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 16 Nov 2016
  • ob/c2+: CB, 30 Nov 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 231, Number 19,332
  • ab: Bollettino, 10 Jul 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast