Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Redmond Garrett Prendiville

Deceased

Archbishop of Perth, Australia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Dec 1900Born
14 Jun 192524.5Ordained PriestPriest of Perth, Australia
11 Jul 193332.5AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Perth, Australia
11 Jul 193332.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Cypsela
22 Oct 193332.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cypsela
24 May 193534.4SucceededArchbishop of Perth, Australia
28 Jun 196867.5DiedArchbishop of Perth, Australia

MicroData Summary for Redmond Garrett Prendiville
Archbishop Redmond Garrett Prendiville (born , died ) Archbishop of Perth

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastleisland, Ireland
Ordained BishopPerth, Archdiocese of Perth

  • a priest for 43.0 years
  • a bishop for 34.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 111
  • bd/op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1933, Number 71
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 43, Number 2,851

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast