Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eduardo Poveda Rodriguez

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Zamora, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Sep 1925Born
2 May 194923.6Ordained PriestPriest
11 Oct 197651.0AppointedBishop of Zamora, Spain
21 Nov 197651.1Ordained BishopBishop of Zamora, Spain
17 Oct 199166.0ResignedBishop of Zamora, Spain
3 Mar 199367.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Zamora, Spain

MicroData Summary for Eduardo Poveda Rodriguez
Bishop Eduardo Poveda Rodriguez (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Zamora

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVillanueva de Castellón
Ordained BishopCathedral, Zamora, Diocese of Zamora
Death PlaceValencia, Archdiocese of Valencia

  • a priest for 43.8 years
  • a bishop for 16.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 123
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 38, Number 2,389
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1993, Page 765

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 9 Mar 2021

Quantcast