Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Poggi

Deceased

Bishop of Fidenza, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Aug 1923Born
16 Mar 194622.5Ordained PriestPriest of Piacenza, Italy
13 Aug 198864.9AppointedBishop of Fidenza, Italy
17 Sep 198865.0Ordained BishopBishop of Fidenza, Italy
16 Oct 198865.1InstalledBishop of Fidenza, Italy
7 Sep 199774.0DiedBishop of Fidenza, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Poggi
Bishop Carlo Poggi (born , died ) Bishop of Fidenza

EventPlace
Birth PlacePiacenza, Diocese of Piacenza
Ordained BishopAssomption, Piacenza, Diocese of Piacenza
Death PlaceFidenza, Diocese of Fidenza
Buried Place (Original)Crypt, San Donnino, Cathedral, Fidenza, Diocese of Fidenza

  • a priest for 51.4 years
  • a bishop for 8.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Number 10,127
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 202, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • loc: AM, 1 Sep 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast