Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gabriel Jules Joseph Piroird, Ist. del Prado †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Constantine (-Hippone), Algeria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Oct 1932Born
27 Jun 196431.7Ordained PriestPriest of Istituto del Prado
25 Mar 198350.4AppointedBishop of Constantine (-Hippone), Algeria
3 Jun 198350.6Ordained BishopBishop of Constantine (-Hippone), Algeria
21 Nov 200876.1RetiredBishop of Constantine (-Hippone), Algeria
3 Apr 201986.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Constantine (-Hippone), Algeria

MicroData Summary for Gabriel Jules Joseph Piroird (VIAF: 69108239)
Bishop Gabriel Jules Joseph Piroird Ist. del Prado (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Constantine (-Hippone)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLyon, France
Ordained BishopBasilica, Hippone, Diocese of Constantine (-Hippone)
Death PlaceLyon-Ecully, France

  • a priest for 54.7 years
  • a bishop for 35.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 21 Nov 2008
  • d: CB, 5 Apr 2019
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 242, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 80, Number 6,536
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 81, Number 6,634

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast