Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Aurelio Pesoa Ribera, O.F.M.

Vicar Apostolic of El Beni o Beni, Bolivia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Oct 1962 Born
15 Feb 198421.3ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
22 Feb 198825.3Solemn VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor
16 Apr 198926.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
25 Mar 201451.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of La Paz, Bolivia
25 Mar 201451.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Leges
5 Jun 201451.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Leges
28 Nov 202058.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of El Beni o Beni, Bolivia
11 Feb 202158.3InstalledVicar Apostolic of El Beni o Beni, Bolivia

MicroData Summary for Aurelio Pesoa Ribera
Bishop Aurelio Pesoa Ribera O.F.M. (born ) Vicar Apostolic of El Beni o Beni

EventPlace
Birth PlaceConcepción
Ordained BishopCathedral, La Paz, Archdiocese of La Paz

Please contact the Bishop through the Vicariate Apostolic of El Beni o Beni.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 25 Mar 2014
  • ob: CB, 4 Apr 2014
  • c2: CB, 29 May 2014
  • c34: CB, 5 Jun 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 218, Number 18,178
  • ab: Bollettino, 28 Nov 2020
  • i: CB, 22 Dec 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 11 Feb 2021

Quantcast