Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François-Joseph Person

Deceased

Bishop of Les Cayes, Haïti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Nov 1895Born
16 Jul 192428.6Ordained PriestPriest
26 Jun 193741.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Les Cayes, Haïti
26 Jun 193741.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Thespiae
5 Dec 193742.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thespiae
30 Aug 194145.7SucceededBishop of Les Cayes, Haïti
24 Sep 194145.8DiedBishop of Les Cayes, Haïti

MicroData Summary for François-Joseph Person
Bishop François-Joseph Person (born , died ) Bishop of Les Cayes

EventPlace
Birth PlacePlouider, Diocese of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon), France
Ordained BishopLes Cayes, Diocese of Les Cayes
Death PlaceLes Cayes, Diocese of Les Cayes

  • a priest for 17.1 years
  • a bishop for 3.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1937, Number 82
  • s: CB, 4 Aug 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast