Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ezequiel Perea Sánchez

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of San Luis Potosí, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Apr 1911Born
25 Oct 193625.5Ordained PriestPriest of San Luis Potosí, México
25 Nov 197261.6AppointedBishop of San Luis Potosí, México
12 Jan 197361.7Ordained BishopBishop of San Luis Potosí, México
25 Apr 198675.0RetiredBishop of San Luis Potosí, México
10 Nov 198675.5DiedBishop Emeritus of San Luis Potosí, México

MicroData Summary for Ezequiel Perea Sánchez
Bishop Ezequiel Perea Sánchez (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of San Luis Potosí

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Luis Potosí, Diocese of San Luis Potosí
Ordained BishopCathedral, San Luis Potosí, Diocese of San Luis Potosí

  • a priest for 50.0 years
  • a bishop for 13.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 30, Number 1,687

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast