Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Peralta y Ballabriga

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Vitoria, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Aug 1911Born
28 Mar 193624.6Ordained PriestPriest
10 Jan 195543.4AppointedBishop of Vitoria, Spain
20 Mar 195543.5Ordained BishopBishop of Vitoria, Spain
10 Jul 197866.9ResignedBishop of Vitoria, Spain
23 Aug 200695.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Vitoria, Spain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Peralta y Ballabriga
Bishop Francisco Peralta y Ballabriga (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Vitoria

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHijar
Ordained BishopNuestra Señora del Pilar, Cathedral, Zaragoza, Archdiocese of Zaragoza

  • a priest for 70.4 years
  • a bishop for 51.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1955, Number 16
  • bd: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2006, Page 796
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 30, Number 1,684
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 81, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast