Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eusebius Alfred Nzigilwa

Bishop of Mpanda, Tanzania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Aug 1966 Born
23 Jun 199528.8Ordained PriestPriest of Dar-es-Salaam, Tanzania
28 Jan 201043.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Dar-es-Salaam, Tanzania
28 Jan 201043.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Mozotcori
19 Mar 201043.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mozotcori
13 May 202053.7AppointedBishop of Mpanda, Tanzania
2 Aug 202053.9InstalledBishop of Mpanda, Tanzania

MicroData Summary for Eusebius Alfred Nzigilwa
Bishop Eusebius Alfred Nzigilwa (born ) Bishop of Mpanda

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMwanza
Ordained BishopMsimbazi Centre, Dar-es-Salaam, Archdiocese of Dar-es-Salaam

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Mpanda.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 28 Jan 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,592
  • ab: Bollettino, 13 May 2020
  • i: CB, 11 Aug 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast