Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ernest-Marie de Jésus-Hostie Charles Albert Nyary, O.C.D. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Baghdad, Iraq


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Aug 1906Born
1932²25.3EnteredMember of Order of Discalced Carmelites
22 May 193730.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Discalced Carmelites
10 Dec 195448.2AppointedSuperior of Baghdad, Iraq
23 Mar 197265.5AppointedArchbishop of Baghdad, Iraq
31 May 197265.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Baghdad, Iraq
1979²72.3ResignedSuperior of Baghdad, Iraq
30 May 198376.7RetiredArchbishop of Baghdad, Iraq
18 Aug 198780.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Baghdad, Iraq

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ernest-Marie de Jésus-Hostie Charles Albert Nyary
Archbishop Ernest-Marie de Jésus-Hostie Charles Albert Nyary O.C.D. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Baghdad

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTurčiansky Sv. Peter, Diocese of Banská Bystrica, Slovakia
Ordained BishopNotre Dame de Fatima, Church, Bagdad, Archdiocese of Baghdad

  • a priest for 50.2 years
  • a bishop for 15.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 19, Number 1,006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 27, Number 1,504

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 10 Mar 2021

Quantcast