Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joaquim Nhanganga Tyombe

Bishop of Uije, Angola


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Nov 1969 Born
24 Nov 200132.0Ordained PriestPriest of Lubango, Angola
2 Feb 202151.1AppointedBishop of Uije, Angola
7 Mar 202151.2Ordained BishopBishop of Uije, Angola
21 Mar 202151.3InstalledBishop of Uije, Angola

MicroData Summary for Joaquim Nhanganga Tyombe
Bishop Joaquim Nhanganga Tyombe (born ) Bishop of Uije

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMambandi-Cacula, Archdiocese of Lubango
Ordained BishopPavilhăo Nossa Senhora do Monte, Lubango City, Archdiocese of Lubango

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Uije.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 2 Feb 2021
  • ob/i: CB, 11 Feb 2021
  • c2+: CB, 7 Mar 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 8 Mar 2021

Quantcast