Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Zithulele Patrick Mvemve

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Klerksdorp, South Africa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 May 1941Born
29 Jun 196928.0Ordained PriestPriest of Johannesburg, South Africa
10 Mar 198644.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Johannesburg, South Africa
10 Mar 198644.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Luperciana
29 Jun 198645.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Luperciana
26 Mar 199452.8AppointedBishop of Klerksdorp, South Africa
26 Apr 201371.9ResignedBishop of Klerksdorp, South Africa
6 Jul 202079.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Klerksdorp, South Africa

MicroData Summary for Zithulele Patrick Mvemve
Bishop Zithulele Patrick Mvemve (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Klerksdorp

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEvaton, Vicariate Apostolic of Johannesburg
Ordained PriestSoweto
Ordained BishopJohannesburg, Diocese of Johannesburg
Death PlaceLife Flora, Hospital, Roodepoort, Archdiocese of Johannesburg

  • a priest for 51.0 years
  • a bishop for 34.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 26 Apr 2013
  • d: CB, 7 Jul 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast