Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Heinrich Vieter, S.A.C. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Cameroun

Titular Bishop of Paraetonium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Feb 1853Born
1887¹33.8Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Catholic Apostolate
18 Mar 189037.0AppointedPrefect of Cameroun
2 Jan 190551.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Cameroun
2 Jan 190551.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Paraetonium
22 Jan 190551.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Paraetonium
7 Nov 191461.7DiedVicar Apostolic of Cameroun

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Heinrich Vieter
Bishop Heinrich Vieter S.A.C. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Cameroun

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKappenberg, Germany

  • a priest for 27.8 years
  • a bishop for 9.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • b/c2+: CB
  • b/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 112, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1905, Number 2
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 288

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast