Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Emile Mushosho Matabaro

Apostolic Administrator of Doruma-Dungu, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

Priest of Bukavu


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Mar 1967 Born
17 Sep 200033.5Ordained PriestPriest of Bukavu, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
12 Jul 202154.3AppointedApostolic Administrator of Doruma-Dungu, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Emile Mushosho Matabaro
Father Emile Mushosho Matabaro (born ) Apostolic Administrator of Doruma-Dungu

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBukavu, Archdiocese of Bukavu
Ordained PriestNotre-Dame de la Paix, Cathedral, Bukavu, Archdiocese of Bukavu

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Doruma-Dungu.

  • a priest for years

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 13 Jul 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 15 Jul 2021

Quantcast