Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Gerald Mamman Musa

Bishop-Elect of Katsina, Nigeria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jan 1971 Born
1 Jun 199625.3Ordained PriestPriest of Sokoto, Nigeria
16 Oct 202352.7AppointedBishop of Katsina, Nigeria
12 Dec 202352.9Ordained BishopBishop of Katsina, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for Gerald Mamman Musa
Father Gerald Mamman Musa (born ) Bishop-Elect of Katsina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGusau, Zamfara, Diocese of Sokoto
Ordained BishopKatsina, Diocese of Katsina

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Katsina.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 16 Oct 2023
  • ob: CB, 23 Oct 2023

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023
Code: web_b, v3.3.4, 13 Nov 2022; Data: 24 Oct 2023