Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Austin Murphy

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Baltimore, Maryland, USA

Titular Bishop of Appiaria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 May 1911Born
10 Jun 193726.0Ordained PriestPriest of Baltimore, Maryland, USA
19 May 196251.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Baltimore, Maryland, USA
19 May 196251.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Appiaria
3 Jul 196251.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Appiaria
29 May 198473.0ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Baltimore, Maryland, USA
17 Nov 199180.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Baltimore, Maryland, USA

MicroData Summary for Thomas Austin Murphy
Bishop Thomas Austin Murphy (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Baltimore

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBaltimore

  • a priest for 54.4 years
  • a bishop for 29.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1962, Number 97
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 64, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast