Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Godefroy Émile M’Pwati

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Pointe-Noire, Congo

Titular Bishop of Muzuca in Proconsulari


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Apr 1928Born
9 Jul 196133.2Ordained PriestPriest of Pointe-Noire, Congo
5 Jun 197547.1AppointedBishop of Pointe-Noire, Congo
7 Dec 197547.6Ordained BishopBishop of Pointe-Noire, Congo
1 Sep 198860.3ResignedBishop of Pointe-Noire, Congo
1 Sep 198860.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Muzuca in Proconsulari
10 Aug 199567.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Pointe-Noire, Congo

MicroData Summary for Godefroy Émile M’Pwati (VIAF: 137144647642563022607)
Bishop Godefroy Émile M’Pwati (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Pointe-Noire

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBilala
Ordained BishopStada Anselmi, Pointe-Noire, Diocese of Pointe-Noire
Death PlaceAdolphe Sicé, Hospital, Pointe-Noire, Diocese of Pointe-Noire

  • a priest for 34.0 years
  • a bishop for 19.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 35, Number 2,129

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 9 Feb 2021

Quantcast