Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Roger Mpungu

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Muyinga, Burundi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1924Born
12 Apr 195531.2Ordained PriestPriest
6 Mar 198056.1AppointedBishop of Muyinga, Burundi
4 May 198056.3Ordained BishopBishop of Muyinga, Burundi
1 Jul 199470.5ResignedBishop of Muyinga, Burundi
6 Dec 200783.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Muyinga, Burundi

MicroData Summary for Roger Mpungu
Bishop Roger Mpungu (born 1924, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Muyinga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMuhwanya
Ordained BishopOpen Air, Esplanade du Palais du Peuple, Kinshasa, Archdiocese of Kinshasa, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

  • a priest for 52.6 years
  • a bishop for 27.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 60, Number 4,571

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast