Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jaak Moris, C.SS.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Roseau, Dominica, Antilles


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Mar 1876Born
6 Oct 189519.5ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
2 Oct 190024.5Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
4 Mar 192245.9AppointedBishop of Roseau, Dominica, Antilles
30 Apr 192246.1Ordained BishopBishop of Roseau, Dominica, Antilles
4 Jun 195781.2DiedBishop of Roseau, Dominica, Antilles

MicroData Summary for Jaak Moris
Bishop Jaak Moris C.SS.R. (born , died ) Bishop of Roseau

EventPlace
Birth PlacePeer, Belgium

  • a priest for 56.6 years
  • a bishop for 35.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1922, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast