Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Teodosio Moreno Quintana

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Huaraz, Peru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 May 1898Born
22 Dec 192325.5Ordained PriestPriest
15 Dec 194042.5AppointedBishop of Cajamarca, Peru
2 Mar 194142.7Ordained BishopBishop of Cajamarca, Peru
27 Jun 194749.0AppointedBishop of Huánuco, Peru
17 Dec 195658.5AppointedBishop of Huaraz, Peru
21 Sep 197173.3RetiredBishop of Huaraz, Peru
4 Nov 198183.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Huaraz, Peru

MicroData Summary for Teodosio Moreno Quintana
Bishop Teodosio Moreno Quintana (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Huaraz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJauja

  • a priest for 57.8 years
  • a bishop for 40.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1941, Number 11
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 9, Number 467, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast