Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domingo Juan Vargas, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Huaraz, Peru

Titular Bishop of Gerara


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jun 1869Born
3 Jul 188718.0ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
26 Aug 192051.1AppointedBishop of Huaraz, Peru
5 May 192151.8Ordained BishopBishop of Huaraz, Peru
1 Aug 193667.1ResignedBishop of Huaraz, Peru
1 Aug 193667.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Gerara
6 Apr 194878.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Huaraz, Peru

MicroData Summary for Domingo Juan Vargas (VIAF: 208735121)
Bishop Domingo Juan Vargas O.P. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Huaraz

EventPlace
Birth PlacePaucarpata
Ordained BishopSantísimo Rosario, Basilica, Lima, Archdiocese of Lima

  • a bishop for 26.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bp: CB, 6 Sep 2012
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1921, Number 28
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 86, Number 7,180

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast