Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dante Frasnelli Tarter, O.S.I. †

Deceased

Prelate Emeritus of Huarí, Peru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jan 1925Born
6 Jul 195227.5Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Saint Joseph
3 Aug 196742.5AppointedPrelate of Huarí, Peru
3 Aug 196742.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Urusi
1 Nov 196742.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Urusi
30 Nov 197752.8ResignedTitular Bishop of Urusi
13 Jun 200176.4RetiredPrelate of Huarí, Peru
10 Jan 202095.0DiedPrelate Emeritus of Huarí, Peru

MicroData Summary for Dante Frasnelli Tarter
Bishop Dante Frasnelli Tarter O.S.I. (born , died ) Prelate Emeritus of Huarí

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDardine, Diocese of Trento, Italy
Death PlaceLima, Archdiocese of Lima

  • a priest for 67.5 years
  • a bishop for 52.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 11 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast