Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Miguel Gaspar Monconill y Viladot, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Caquetá, Colombia

Titular Bishop of Cadossia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 May 1891Born
17 May 191423.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
30 Jun 193039.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Caquetá, Colombia
30 Jun 193039.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Cadossia
26 Oct 193039.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cadossia
26 Feb 194654.7DiedVicar Apostolic of Caquetá, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Miguel Gaspar Monconill y Viladot
Bishop Miguel Gaspar Monconill y Viladot O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Caquetá

EventPlace
Birth PlacePinell, Spain

  • a priest for 31.7 years
  • a bishop for 15.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1930, Number 71

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast