Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ludovick Joseph Minde, ALCP/OSS

Bishop of Moshi, Tanzania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Dec 1952 Born
26 Jun 198633.5Ordained PriestPriest of Opus Spiritus Sancti
24 Apr 200148.3AppointedBishop of Kahama, Tanzania
5 Aug 200148.6Ordained BishopBishop of Kahama, Tanzania
2 Dec 201966.9AppointedBishop of Moshi, Tanzania
19 Mar 202067.2InstalledBishop of Moshi, Tanzania

MicroData Summary for Ludovick Joseph Minde
Bishop Ludovick Joseph Minde ALCP/OSS (born ) Bishop of Moshi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKibosho
Ordained BishopCathedral, Kahama, Diocese of Kahama

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Moshi.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 164, Number 14,010
  • ab: Bollettino, 2 Dec 2019
  • i: AM, 4 Mar 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast