Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Salvatore Meo

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy

Titular Bishop of Methone


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Aug 1855Born
19 Feb 192670.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
19 Feb 192670.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Methone
18 Apr 192670.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Methone
15 Nov 193681.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Salvatore Meo
Bishop Salvatore Meo (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Napoli {Naples}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}
Ordained BishopSt. Janvier, Cathedral, Napoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}

  • a bishop for 10.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1933
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1937
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1926, Number 18
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 28, Number 1,575

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast