Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Zsolt Marton

Bishop of Vác, Hungary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Mar 1966 Born
20 Jun 199832.2Ordained PriestPriest of Vác, Hungary
12 Jul 201953.2AppointedBishop of Vác, Hungary
24 Aug 201953.4Ordained BishopBishop of Vác, Hungary

MicroData Summary for Zsolt Marton
Bishop Zsolt Marton (born ) Bishop of Vác

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBudapest, Archdiocese of Esztergom
Ordained BishopCathedral, Vác, Diocese of Vác

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Vác.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 12 Jul 2019
  • ob: CB, 16 Jul 2019
  • c2+: CB, 23 Jul 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 241, Number 20,228

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast