Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alfred Adewale Martins

Archbishop of Lagos, Nigeria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jun 1959 Born
18 Sep 198324.2Ordained PriestPriest
24 Oct 199738.3AppointedBishop of Abeokuta, Nigeria
24 Jan 199838.6Ordained BishopBishop of Abeokuta, Nigeria
25 May 201252.9AppointedArchbishop of Lagos, Nigeria
4 Aug 201253.1InstalledArchbishop of Lagos, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for Alfred Adewale Martins
(VIAF: 232214709; WikiData: Q2484130)
Archbishop Alfred Adewale Martins (born ) Archbishop of Lagos

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAbeokuta

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Lagos.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Number 13,225
  • ab: Bollettino, 25 May 2012
  • i: CB, 5 Aug 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2022
Code: web_b, v3.3.4, 13 Nov 2022; Data: 9 Dec 2022