Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Aloysius Marshall

Deceased

Bishop of Springfield in Massachusetts, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Apr 1928Born
19 Dec 195325.6Ordained PriestPriest of Worcester, Massachusetts, USA
14 Dec 197143.6AppointedBishop of Burlington, Vermont, USA
25 Jan 197243.7Ordained BishopBishop of Burlington, Vermont, USA
27 Dec 199163.6AppointedBishop of Springfield in Massachusetts, USA
18 Feb 199263.8InstalledBishop of Springfield in Massachusetts, USA
3 Jul 199466.1DiedBishop of Springfield in Massachusetts, USA

MicroData Summary for John Aloysius Marshall
Bishop John Aloysius Marshall (born , died ) Bishop of Springfield in Massachusetts

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWorcester, MA
Ordained PriestRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopImmaculate Conception, Cathedral, Burlington, Diocese of Burlington, Vermont

  • a priest for 40.5 years
  • a bishop for 22.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 17, Number 910

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast