Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giacinto-Boulos Marcuzzo

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine

Titular Bishop of Emmaüs


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Apr 1945 Born
22 Jun 196924.1Ordained PriestPriest
29 Apr 199348.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine
29 Apr 199348.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Siminina
3 Jul 199348.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Siminina
29 Oct 199449.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Emmaüs
29 Aug 202075.3RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine

MicroData Summary for Giacinto-Boulos Marcuzzo
Bishop Giacinto-Boulos Marcuzzo (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Polo di Piave, Diocese of Vittorio Veneto, Italy
Ordained BishopSt-Sépulcre, Basilica, Jerusalem, Patriarchate of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}

Please contact the Bishop through the Patriarchate of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 136, Number 12,162
  • r: Bollettino, 29 Aug 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast