Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Paul Casimir Marcinkus

Deceased

Pro-President Emeritus of the Pontifical Commission for Vatican City State

Titular Archbishop of Horta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jan 1922Born
3 May 194725.3Ordained PriestPriest of Chicago, Illinois, USA
24 Dec 196846.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Horta
24 Dec 196846.9AppointedSecretary of the Roman Curia - Other
6 Jan 196946.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Horta
197249.9AppointedPresident of the Roman Curia - Other
26 Sep 198159.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Horta
26 Sep 198159.6AppointedPro-President of the Pontifical Commission for Vatican City State
30 Oct 199068.7ResignedPro-President of the Pontifical Commission for Vatican City State
20 Feb 200684.0DiedPro-President Emeritus of the Pontifical Commission for Vatican City State

MicroData Summary for Paul Casimir Marcinkus (VIAF: 69728441)
Archbishop Paul Casimir Marcinkus (born , died ) Pro-President Emeritus of Vatican City State

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCicero, IL, Archdiocese of Chicago, Illinois, USA
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceSun City, AZ, Diocese of Phoenix, Arizona, USA
Buried Place (Original)St. Casimir Catholic, Cemetery, Chicago, Archdiocese of Chicago, Illinois, USA

  • a priest for 58.7 years
  • a bishop for 37.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)
  • loc/tarc: AM, 25 May 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast