Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Laurent Akran Mandjo

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Yopougon, Côte d’Ivoire


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Nov 1940Born
11 Jul 197130.6Ordained PriestPriest
8 Jun 198241.5AppointedBishop of Yopougon, Côte d’Ivoire
18 Sep 198241.8Ordained BishopBishop of Yopougon, Côte d’Ivoire
28 Nov 201575.0RetiredBishop of Yopougon, Côte d’Ivoire
25 Aug 202079.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Yopougon, Côte d’Ivoire

MicroData Summary for Laurent Akran Mandjo
Bishop Laurent Akran Mandjo (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Yopougon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSongon-Agba
Ordained BishopAbidjan, Archdiocese of Abidjan
Death PlaceAbidjan, Archdiocese of Abidjan

  • a priest for 49.1 years
  • a bishop for 37.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 28 Nov 2015
  • d: CB, 25 Aug 2020
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 75, Number 6,042

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 3 Jan 2021

Quantcast